Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB343 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fletcher (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 343
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 2, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 17, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting and recording of a motor vehicle accident
 involving an official vehicle driven by a peace officer,
 firefighter, or an emergency medical services employee in the
 course of official duties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.042(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The record of a license holder who is employed as a peace
 officer, fire fighter, or emergency medical services employee of
 this state, a political subdivision of this state, or a special
 purpose district may not include information relating to a traffic
 accident that occurs [during an emergency] while the peace officer,
 fire fighter, or emergency medical services employee is driving an
 official vehicle in the course and scope of the license holder's
 official duties if:
 (1)  the traffic accident resulted in damages to
 property of less than $1,000; or
 (2)  an investigation of the accident by a peace
 officer, other than a peace officer involved in the accident,
 determines that the peace officer, fire fighter, or emergency
 medical services employee involved in the accident was not at
 fault.
 SECTION 2.  Section 550.064(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  An accident report form prepared by the department must:
 (1)  require sufficiently detailed information to
 disclose the cause and conditions of and the persons and vehicles
 involved in an accident if the form is for the report to be made by a
 person involved in or investigating the accident;
 (2)  include a way to designate and identify a peace
 officer, firefighter, or emergency medical services employee who
 [during an emergency] is involved in an accident while driving a law
 enforcement vehicle, fire department vehicle, or emergency medical
 services vehicle while performing the person's duties;
 (3)  require a statement by a person described by
 Subdivision (2) as to the nature of the accident [emergency]; and
 (4)  include a way to designate whether an individual
 involved in an accident wants to be contacted by a person seeking to
 obtain employment as a professional described by Section 38.01(12),
 Penal Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *