House | 04/26/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 893 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 893 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |