House | 04/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2358 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/25/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/25/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 895 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 895 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |