House | 04/19/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1976 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 539 | Journal Page: 1936 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Postponed | 4/19/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1807 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1807 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Postponed | 4/14/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1653 |
House | 04/11/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Postponed | 4/11/11 1:00 PM | Journal Page: 1470 |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1469 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1098 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/15/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 11/23/2010 | Filed |