Senate | 05/20/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2373 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2373 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2321 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4064 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3894 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1067 | Journal Page: 3894 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3894 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3894 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3761 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3761 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3761 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#1028 | Journal Page: 3760 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amendment tabled | 3-Farrar | Journal Page: 3760 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amended | 1-Guillen | Journal Page: 3758 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3758 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 895 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 895 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |