Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3465 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sheffield (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 3465
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 3, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Economic
 Development; May 13, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the period for which a school district's participation
 in certain tax increment financing reinvestment zones may be taken
 into account in determining the total taxable value of property in
 the school district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 403.302, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e-1) to read as follows:
 (e-1)  This subsection applies only to a reinvestment zone
 created by a municipality that has a population of 70,000 or less
 and is located in a county in which all or part of a military
 installation is located. Notwithstanding Subsection (e), if on or
 after January 1, 2017, the municipality adopts an ordinance
 designating a termination date for the zone that is later than the
 termination date designated in the ordinance creating the zone, the
 number of years for which the total dollar amount may be deducted
 under Subsection (d)(4) is limited to the duration of the zone as
 determined under Section 311.017, Tax Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *