E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/24/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5764
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3102
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5036
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4224
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1370
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#511
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 896
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|