82R9452 TRH-D By: Patrick H.B. No. 3471 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the establishment of an advisory committee to study the feasibility of requiring dental examinations for certain public school students. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. ESTABLISHMENT OF ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) The commissioner of state health services shall establish an advisory committee to study and provide recommendations to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the legislature regarding the feasibility of requiring dental examinations for public school students who are entering the first grade. (b) The advisory committee consists of the following eight members appointed by the commissioner of state health services: (1) a representative of the Department of State Health Services; (2) a representative of the Texas Education Agency; (3) a member of the Texas Dental Association; (4) a member of the Texas Academy of Pediatric Dentistry; (5) a member of the Texas Dental Hygienists Association; (6) a member of the Texas School Nurses Organization; (7) an individual who: (A) holds a license issued under Subtitle D, Title 3, Occupations Code; and (B) is currently engaged in the practice of dentistry; and (8) a member of the Texas State Board of Dental Examiners. (c) The commissioner of state health services shall ensure that the members of the advisory committee reflect the diverse geographic regions and population groups of this state. (d) The representative of the Department of State Health Services shall serve as chair of the advisory committee. (e) An advisory committee member is not entitled to reimbursement of expenses or to compensation. (f) Not later than November 1, 2011, the commissioner of state health services shall appoint the members to the advisory committee as required by this section. (g) Not later than December 1, 2011, the advisory committee shall hold an organizational meeting. The committee shall meet regularly as necessary. (h) The advisory committee shall study: (1) the advantages and disadvantages of requiring a dental examination performed by a dentist for each student not earlier than the 180th day before or not later than the 30th day after the date the student enters the first grade; and (2) the costs, resources, and best practices associated with requiring the dental examination described by Subdivision (1). (i) Not later than December 1, 2012, the advisory committee shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the legislature a report outlining the feasibility of requiring dental examinations for public school students who are entering the first grade. SECTION 2. INAPPLICABILITY OF CERTAIN LAW. Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the advisory committee established under this Act. SECTION 3. EXPIRATION. The advisory committee established under this Act is abolished and this Act expires on December 1, 2013. SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011.