House | 04/14/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1835 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/15/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 361 | |
House | 11/29/2010 | Filed |