By: Menendez (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 35 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011; April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; May 6, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to extending a local behavioral health intervention pilot project. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Sections 1(f) and (j), Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, are amended to read as follows: (f) Not later than December 1, 2012 [2010], the local mental health authority involved in the pilot project shall submit a report to the department regarding the local behavioral health intervention pilot project, including: (1) a comprehensive analysis of the efficacy of the project; and (2) the local authority's findings and recommendations. (j) This Act expires September 1, 2013 [2011]. SECTION 2. (a) It is the intent of the legislature that amendments to Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, made by this Act and any other amendments to that chapter made by another Act of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, shall be harmonized, if possible, as provided by Section 311.025(b), Government Code, so that effect may be given to each amendment. (b) If an amendment to Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, made by this Act and an amendment to that chapter made by another Act of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, are irreconcilable, it is the intent of the legislature that the amendment to Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, made by this Act prevail, regardless of the relative effective dates or dates of enactment of the irreconcilable amendments. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *