1 | 1 | | By: Menendez (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 35 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
---|
4 | 4 | | and Human Services; May 6, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to extending a local behavioral health intervention pilot |
---|
11 | 11 | | project. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Sections 1(f) and (j), Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), |
---|
14 | 14 | | Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, are amended to |
---|
15 | 15 | | read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (f) Not later than December 1, 2012 [2010], the local mental |
---|
17 | 17 | | health authority involved in the pilot project shall submit a |
---|
18 | 18 | | report to the department regarding the local behavioral health |
---|
19 | 19 | | intervention pilot project, including: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) a comprehensive analysis of the efficacy of the |
---|
21 | 21 | | project; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) the local authority's findings and |
---|
23 | 23 | | recommendations. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (j) This Act expires September 1, 2013 [2011]. |
---|
25 | 25 | | SECTION 2. (a) It is the intent of the legislature that |
---|
26 | 26 | | amendments to Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), Acts of the 81st |
---|
27 | 27 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, made by this Act and any other |
---|
28 | 28 | | amendments to that chapter made by another Act of the 82nd |
---|
29 | 29 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, shall be harmonized, if |
---|
30 | 30 | | possible, as provided by Section 311.025(b), Government Code, so |
---|
31 | 31 | | that effect may be given to each amendment. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (b) If an amendment to Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), Acts of the |
---|
33 | 33 | | 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, made by this Act and an |
---|
34 | 34 | | amendment to that chapter made by another Act of the 82nd |
---|
35 | 35 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, are irreconcilable, it is the |
---|
36 | 36 | | intent of the legislature that the amendment to Chapter 356 (H.B. |
---|
37 | 37 | | 1232), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, made by |
---|
38 | 38 | | this Act prevail, regardless of the relative effective dates or |
---|
39 | 39 | | dates of enactment of the irreconcilable amendments. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
41 | 41 | | * * * * * |
---|