H.B. No. 35 AN ACT relating to extending a local behavioral health intervention pilot project. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Sections 1(f) and (j), Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, are amended to read as follows: (f) Not later than December 1, 2012 [2010], the local mental health authority involved in the pilot project shall submit a report to the department regarding the local behavioral health intervention pilot project, including: (1) a comprehensive analysis of the efficacy of the project; and (2) the local authority's findings and recommendations. (j) This Act expires September 1, 2013 [2011]. SECTION 2. (a) It is the intent of the legislature that amendments to Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, made by this Act and any other amendments to that chapter made by another Act of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, shall be harmonized, if possible, as provided by Section 311.025(b), Government Code, so that effect may be given to each amendment. (b) If an amendment to Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, made by this Act and an amendment to that chapter made by another Act of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011, are irreconcilable, it is the intent of the legislature that the amendment to Chapter 356 (H.B. 1232), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, made by this Act prevail, regardless of the relative effective dates or dates of enactment of the irreconcilable amendments. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 35 was passed by the House on April 14, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 3, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 35 was passed by the Senate on May 17, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor