E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5116
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6915
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6095
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6096
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1582
|
Journal Page: 6095
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6095
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5761
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3590
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3685
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#998
|
Journal Page: 3684
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3684
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3684
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3593
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 361
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 361
|
House
|
11/29/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|