House | 04/20/2011 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Referred to subcommittee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 936 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 936 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |