E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2809
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4655
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4656
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1240
|
Journal Page: 4655
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4655
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4224
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2563
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1370
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#511
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2196
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|