05/13/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | |||
05/13/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | |||
05/13/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |||
05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |||
04/21/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |||
04/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | |||
04/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |||
04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |||
04/18/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |||
04/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | |||
04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | |||
04/13/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |||
04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | |||
04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |||
03/22/2011 | Referred to Transportation | |||
03/22/2011 | Read first time | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed |