Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3573 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Taylor, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 3573
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to limiting the disclosure of certain information
 regarding certain charitable organizations, trusts, private
 foundations, and grant-making organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 2252, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2252.906 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2252.906.  DISCLOSURE PROTECTIONS FOR CERTAIN
 CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS, CHARITABLE TRUSTS, AND PRIVATE
 FOUNDATIONS.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Charitable organization" means an organization
 that is exempt from federal income tax under Section 501(a),
 Internal Revenue Code of 1986, by being listed as an exempt
 organization in Section 501(c) of that code.  The term does not
 include a property owners' or homeowners' association.
 (2)  "Grant-making organization" means an organization
 that makes grants to charitable organizations but is not a private
 foundation, private foundation trust, or split interest trust.
 (3)  "Private foundation" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 509(a), Internal Revenue Code of 1986.
 (4)  "Split interest trust" means an irrevocable trust
 in which the income is first dispersed to the beneficiaries of the
 trust for a specified period and the remainder of the trust is
 donated to a designated charity.
 (b)  Unless the individual has given written consent to the
 disclosure, a governmental entity may not require a charitable
 organization, private foundation trust, split interest trust, or
 private foundation to disclose the race, religion, gender, national
 origin, socioeconomic status, age, ethnicity, disability, marital
 status, sexual orientation, or political party registration of an
 employee, officer, director, trustee, or member of the
 organization, trust, or foundation.
 (c)  Unless the individual has given written consent to the
 disclosure, a governmental entity may not require a private
 foundation, private foundation trust, split interest trust, or
 grant-making organization to disclose the race, religion, gender,
 national origin, socioeconomic status, age, ethnicity, disability,
 marital status, sexual orientation, or political party
 registration of:
 (1)  a person who receives money or in-kind
 contributions from or contracts with the foundation, trust, or
 organization; or
 (2)  an employee, officer, director, trustee, member,
 or owner of an entity that receives money or in-kind contributions
 from or contracts with the foundation, trust, or organization.
 (d)  A governmental entity may not:
 (1)  require that the governing board or officers of a
 charitable organization, private foundation trust, split interest
 trust, or private foundation include an individual of any
 particular race, religion, gender, national origin, socioeconomic
 status, age, ethnicity, disability, marital status, sexual
 orientation, or political party registration;
 (2)  prohibit an individual from serving as a board
 member or officer of the organization, trust, or foundation based
 on the individual's familial relationship to:
 (A)  another board member or officer of the
 organization, trust, or foundation; or
 (B)  a donor to the organization, trust, or
 foundation; or
 (3)  require the governing board or officers of the
 organization, trust, or foundation to include one or more
 individuals who do not share a familial relationship with the board
 members or officers or with a donor.
 (e)  Except as a condition on the expenditure of particular
 funds imposed by the donor of the funds, a governmental entity may
 not require a charitable organization, private foundation trust,
 split interest trust, or private foundation to distribute its funds
 to or contract with a person or entity based on the race, religion,
 gender, national origin, socioeconomic status, age, ethnicity,
 disability, marital status, sexual orientation, or political party
 registration of:
 (1)  the person or of an employee, officer, director,
 trustee, member, or owner of the entity; or
 (2)  the populations, locales, or communities served by
 the person or entity.
 (f)  This section does not limit the authority of the
 attorney general to investigate or enforce laws of this state in
 accordance with the attorney general's duty to protect the public
 interest in charity.
 SECTION 2.  Section 2252.906, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, does not apply to or invalidate a contract in effect
 before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *