E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6275
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3715
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5619
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1476
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5618
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5045
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3118
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Davis
|
Journal Page: 3117
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3117
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3117
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2583
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2315
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3875
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1049
|
Journal Page: 3874
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3874
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3874
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#996
|
Journal Page: 3682
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3682
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
5-Workman
|
Journal Page: 3682
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-T. Smith
|
Journal Page: 3681
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3681
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 3666
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3598
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#974
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Failed to pass to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3597
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Giddings, Berman, Darby, and Elkins
|
Journal Page: 3595
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3594
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1115
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
House
|
12/01/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|