House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5393
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 3396
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3393
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Fraser
|
Journal Page: 2857
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2857
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2857
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2857
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#950
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3537
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3201
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1049
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|