Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2272 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#1019 | Journal Page: 3703 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3703 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3703 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3637 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3637 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/09/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 315 | |
House | 02/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 315 | |
House | 11/08/2010 | Filed |