Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2373 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2373 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2321 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4064 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3866 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3840 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Amended | 1-Truitt | Journal Page: 3840 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3840 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1050 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1050 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |