House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1503 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 1051 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1051 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |