Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3625 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R13921 CAS-D
 By: Carter H.B. No. 3625


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a task force on school district administrative
 efficiency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 11, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 11.0031 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.0031.  TASK FORCE ON ADMINISTRATIVE EFFICIENCY. (a)
 A task force shall be established to review and analyze agency data
 collected from school districts on the costs of district
 administrative services and to determine how school district
 administration may be made more efficient through administrative
 reorganization and consolidation.
 (b)  The task force shall be composed of seven members as
 follows:
 (1)  three members appointed by the governor as
 follows:
 (A)  a parent of a public school student in this
 state;
 (B)  a business person with professional
 experience relating to reorganization and modernization of a
 private or public organization; and
 (C)  a retired superintendent of a school district
 in this state;
 (2)  two members appointed by the lieutenant governor
 as follows:
 (A)  a retired principal of a public school in
 this state or a retired superintendent of a school district in this
 state; and
 (B)  a person with not less than 10 years of
 classroom teaching experience in a public school in this state; and
 (3)  two members appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives as follows:
 (A)  a person employed by or otherwise associated
 with an institution of higher education in this state who has an
 academic degree or other background in economics, finance,
 accounting, or business; and
 (B)  a person with professional experience
 relating to reorganization and modernization of a private or public
 organization or a retired superintendent of a school district in
 this state.
 (c)  Appointments to the task force shall be made not later
 than October 1, 2011.
 (d)  The first meeting of the task force shall be held not
 later than November 1, 2011, at the call of the governor. At that
 meeting, the members shall elect a presiding officer from among the
 members.
 (e)  After the first meeting, meetings of the task force
 shall be at the call of the presiding officer as necessary to
 accomplish the goals of the task force.
 (f)  If a vacancy occurs on the task force, the vacancy shall
 be filled in the same manner as the initial appointment.
 (g)  The agency, the house of representatives, and the senate
 shall provide staff support for the task force.
 (h)  A member of the task force is not entitled to
 compensation for service on the task force but is entitled to
 reimbursement for travel expenses as provided by Chapter 660,
 Government Code, and the General Appropriations Act.
 (i)  Not later than December 1, 2012, the task force shall
 submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the presiding officer of each
 legislative standing committee with primary jurisdiction over
 primary and secondary education or state fiscal appropriations
 recommendations concerning how school district administration may
 be made more efficient through administrative reorganization and
 consolidation.
 (j)  This section expires January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.