E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5956
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3502
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5252
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5253
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5253
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1380
|
Journal Page: 5252
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5252
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5037
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2761
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1740
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#359
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Amended
|
2-C. Howard
|
Journal Page: 1679
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/12/11 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1652
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1652
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/11/11 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1227
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
House
|
12/02/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|