E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
06/02/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Comptroller
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
|
|
Journal Page: 5148
|
House
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/31/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5834
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5835
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 5835
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1527
|
Journal Page: 5834
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5834
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5397
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3493
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2267
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#954
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|