House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1098 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 385 | |
House | 02/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 385 | |
House | 12/02/2010 | Filed |