Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4064
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1044
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3840
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3840
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1057
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|