Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3696 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 29, 2011      TO: Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3696 by Gallego ( Relating to concurrent state and federal jurisdiction over units of the national park system in this state.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend portions of the Parks and Wildlife Code relating to concurrent state and federal legislative jurisdiction over the national parks in Texas. The bill amendments relating to the civil and political rights of park residents and retrocession of concurrent jurisdiction would expire on September 1, 2012 unless the governor has received written acceptance of concurrent jurisdiction under Section 23.051(b) by that date. The bill would provide that the Governor cede to the US federal government concurrent legislative jurisdiction over territory currently owned or acquired by the US federal government within the boundaries of any unit of the national park system located in the state of Texas. Simultaneously, the Governor will accept from the National Parks Service a retrocession of concurrent legislative jurisdiction over the territory within the boundaries of Big Bend National Park and the Rio Grande Wild and Scenic River, currently under exclusive federal jurisdiction. The bill would provide that no later than October 1, 2011 the Governor will forward a copy of the bill to the National Parks Service to request acceptance of the changes proposed. Upon the written confirmation from the National Parks Service, the Governor will publish a notice of confirmation in the Texas Register no later than the 21st day after the date the confirmation was received.  No significant fiscal implication to the state is anticipated from bill provisions. The bill would take immediate effect if the bill receives two-thirds the vote of all members in both houses.  Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:802 Parks and Wildlife Department, 301 Office of the Governor   LBB Staff:  JOB, TB, KM    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 29, 2011





  TO: Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3696 by Gallego ( Relating to concurrent state and federal jurisdiction over units of the national park system in this state.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3696 by Gallego ( Relating to concurrent state and federal jurisdiction over units of the national park system in this state.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism 

 Honorable Ryan Guillen, Chair, House Committee on Culture, Recreation & Tourism 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3696 by Gallego ( Relating to concurrent state and federal jurisdiction over units of the national park system in this state.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB3696 by Gallego ( Relating to concurrent state and federal jurisdiction over units of the national park system in this state.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend portions of the Parks and Wildlife Code relating to concurrent state and federal legislative jurisdiction over the national parks in Texas. The bill amendments relating to the civil and political rights of park residents and retrocession of concurrent jurisdiction would expire on September 1, 2012 unless the governor has received written acceptance of concurrent jurisdiction under Section 23.051(b) by that date. The bill would provide that the Governor cede to the US federal government concurrent legislative jurisdiction over territory currently owned or acquired by the US federal government within the boundaries of any unit of the national park system located in the state of Texas. Simultaneously, the Governor will accept from the National Parks Service a retrocession of concurrent legislative jurisdiction over the territory within the boundaries of Big Bend National Park and the Rio Grande Wild and Scenic River, currently under exclusive federal jurisdiction. The bill would provide that no later than October 1, 2011 the Governor will forward a copy of the bill to the National Parks Service to request acceptance of the changes proposed. Upon the written confirmation from the National Parks Service, the Governor will publish a notice of confirmation in the Texas Register no later than the 21st day after the date the confirmation was received.  No significant fiscal implication to the state is anticipated from bill provisions. The bill would take immediate effect if the bill receives two-thirds the vote of all members in both houses.  Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011.

The bill would amend portions of the Parks and Wildlife Code relating to concurrent state and federal legislative jurisdiction over the national parks in Texas. The bill amendments relating to the civil and political rights of park residents and retrocession of concurrent jurisdiction would expire on September 1, 2012 unless the governor has received written acceptance of concurrent jurisdiction under Section 23.051(b) by that date.

The bill would provide that the Governor cede to the US federal government concurrent legislative jurisdiction over territory currently owned or acquired by the US federal government within the boundaries of any unit of the national park system located in the state of Texas. Simultaneously, the Governor will accept from the National Parks Service a retrocession of concurrent legislative jurisdiction over the territory within the boundaries of Big Bend National Park and the Rio Grande Wild and Scenic River, currently under exclusive federal jurisdiction.

The bill would provide that no later than October 1, 2011 the Governor will forward a copy of the bill to the National Parks Service to request acceptance of the changes proposed. Upon the written confirmation from the National Parks Service, the Governor will publish a notice of confirmation in the Texas Register no later than the 21st day after the date the confirmation was received. 

No significant fiscal implication to the state is anticipated from bill provisions. The bill would take immediate effect if the bill receives two-thirds the vote of all members in both houses.  Otherwise, the bill would take effect September 1, 2011.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 802 Parks and Wildlife Department, 301 Office of the Governor

802 Parks and Wildlife Department, 301 Office of the Governor

LBB Staff: JOB, TB, KM

 JOB, TB, KM