Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB371 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hochberg, Carter, Gallego H.B. No. 371
 (Senate Sponsor - Hegar)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 21, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting deferred adjudication community
 supervision for certain defendants convicted of murder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5(d), Article 42.12, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  In all other cases the judge may grant deferred
 adjudication unless:
 (1)  the defendant is charged with an offense:
 (A)  under Sections 49.04-49.08, Penal Code; or
 (B)  for which punishment may be increased under
 Section 481.134(c), (d), (e), or (f), Health and Safety Code, if it
 is shown that the defendant has been previously convicted of an
 offense for which punishment was increased under any one of those
 subsections;
 (2)  the defendant:
 (A)  is charged with an offense under Section
 21.11, 22.011, or 22.021, Penal Code, regardless of the age of the
 victim, or a felony described by Section 13B(b) of this article; and
 (B)  has previously been placed on community
 supervision for any offense under Paragraph (A) of this
 subdivision; [or]
 (3)  the defendant is charged with an offense under:
 (A)  Section 21.02, Penal Code; or
 (B)  Section 22.021, Penal Code, that is
 punishable under Subsection (f) of that section or under Section
 12.42(c)(3), Penal Code; or
 (4)  the defendant is charged with an offense under
 Section 19.02, Penal Code, except that the judge may grant deferred
 adjudication on determining that the defendant did not cause the
 death of the deceased, did not intend to kill the deceased or
 another, and did not anticipate that a human life would be taken.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *