Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3717 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 4, 2011      TO: Honorable Veronica Gonzales, Chair, House Committee on Border & Intergovernmental Affairs      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3717 by Guillen ( Relating to a study regarding emergency service in rural areas.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require the Commission on State Emergency Communications to conduct a study regarding emergency service in rural areas and submit a report to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House not later than December 1, 2012.  The bill would expire December 31, 2012 and would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds or on September 1, 2011.  It is anticipated that any costs associated with implementation of the legislation could be absorbed within existing resources. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:477 Commission on State Emergency Communications   LBB Staff:  JOB, KM, BTA    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 4, 2011





  TO: Honorable Veronica Gonzales, Chair, House Committee on Border & Intergovernmental Affairs      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3717 by Guillen ( Relating to a study regarding emergency service in rural areas.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Veronica Gonzales, Chair, House Committee on Border & Intergovernmental Affairs
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3717 by Guillen ( Relating to a study regarding emergency service in rural areas.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Veronica Gonzales, Chair, House Committee on Border & Intergovernmental Affairs 

 Honorable Veronica Gonzales, Chair, House Committee on Border & Intergovernmental Affairs 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3717 by Guillen ( Relating to a study regarding emergency service in rural areas.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB3717 by Guillen ( Relating to a study regarding emergency service in rural areas.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require the Commission on State Emergency Communications to conduct a study regarding emergency service in rural areas and submit a report to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House not later than December 1, 2012.  The bill would expire December 31, 2012 and would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds or on September 1, 2011.  It is anticipated that any costs associated with implementation of the legislation could be absorbed within existing resources.

The bill would require the Commission on State Emergency Communications to conduct a study regarding emergency service in rural areas and submit a report to the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, and Speaker of the House not later than December 1, 2012.  The bill would expire December 31, 2012 and would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds or on September 1, 2011.  It is anticipated that any costs associated with implementation of the legislation could be absorbed within existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 477 Commission on State Emergency Communications

477 Commission on State Emergency Communications

LBB Staff: JOB, KM, BTA

 JOB, KM, BTA