E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5147
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4341
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6104
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1585
|
Journal Page: 6104
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6104
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5757
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2590
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2583
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1160
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4215
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|