House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1060 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1060 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |