Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3744 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82R3037 KFF-D
 By: Gonzales of Hidalgo H.B. No. 3744


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reimbursement methodology used for certain services
 provided to Medicaid recipients.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.02115 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02115.  REIMBURSEMENT METHODOLOGY FOR MEDICAID
 INPATIENT HOSPITAL SERVICES. (a)  The commission shall convert the
 reimbursement methodology used under the Medicaid program to
 reimburse inpatient hospital services to an all patient refined
 diagnosis-related groups (DRG) methodology, subject to adjustments
 required by this section, to incentivize controlling costs and
 improving efficiency.
 (b)  The commission shall adjust rates under the
 reimbursement methodology required by Subsection (a) to ensure the
 equitable reimbursement of hospitals for inpatient services by
 adjusting the rates as necessary to take into account different
 markets and provider responsibilities, including by making rate
 adjustments to account for:
 (1)  whether a hospital is a teaching institution;
 (2)  market wage indexes; and
 (3)  the extent to which a hospital provides
 comparatively high levels of uncompensated care.
 (c)  The commission shall adjust rates under the
 reimbursement methodology required by Subsection (a) to provide
 incentives for hospitals to provide higher quality of care.  To
 provide the incentives, the commission shall establish a hospital
 value-based purchasing program that includes quality standards
 established by the executive commissioner by rule. Incentives
 provided under the program must be based on whether a hospital
 meets, or improves the hospital's performance with respect to
 meeting, those quality standards.  Under the program, the
 commission may:
 (1)  reduce a hospital's reimbursement rates by two
 percent each fiscal year the hospital fails to meet, or to make
 progress towards meeting, the quality standards; and
 (2)  use money saved as a result of the reimbursement
 rate reductions to award hospitals that meet, or make progress
 towards meeting, the quality standards.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c)(1), the commission may
 reduce reimbursement rates as provided by that subsection only by
 the following percentages:
 (1)  one percent for the state fiscal year beginning
 September 1, 2012;
 (2)  1.25 percent for the state fiscal year beginning
 September 1, 2013;
 (3)  1.5 percent for the state fiscal year beginning
 September 1, 2014; and
 (4)  1.75 percent for the state fiscal year beginning
 September 1, 2015.
 (e)  This subsection and Subsection (d) expire September 1,
 2017.
 SECTION 2.  (a) As soon as possible after the effective date
 of this Act:
 (1)  the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 convert the Medicaid hospital services reimbursement methodology
 and implement the hospital value-based purchasing program as
 required by Section 531.02115, Government Code, as added by this
 Act; and
 (2)  the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall adopt the quality standards for use in
 the hospital value-based purchasing program as required by that
 section.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Sections 531.02115(c) and (d),
 Government Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services
 Commission may not reduce reimbursement rates as provided by those
 sections before September 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.