05/04/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |||
05/04/2011 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | |||
05/04/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |||
04/28/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | |||
04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |||
04/20/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | |||
04/20/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |||
04/20/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |||
04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | |||
04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | |||
04/13/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |||
04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |||
03/23/2011 | Read first time | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed |