Senate | 05/11/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2217 | |
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2217 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2058 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2982 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#762 | Journal Page: 2981 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2981 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2981 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2897 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2897 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2897 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1066 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1066 | |
House | 03/15/2011 | Filed |