Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3808 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: King of Zavala (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 3808
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 17, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 17, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fishing with certain archery equipment in certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 284.001, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (d) and adding Subsection
 (f) to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Archery equipment" means a longbow, recurved bow,
 compound bow, or crossbow.
 (2)  "Firearm" has the meaning assigned by Section
 62.014.
 (3) [(2)]  "Navigable river or stream" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 90.001.
 (d)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  an individual acting in the scope of the
 individual's duties as a peace officer or department employee; [or]
 (2)  the discharge of a shotgun loaded with ammunition
 that releases only shot when discharged; or
 (3)  an individual engaging in fishing using archery
 equipment, if the individual is in compliance with Subsection (f).
 (f)  An individual engaging in fishing using archery
 equipment may not possess while fishing:
 (1)  an arrow equipped with fletching of any kind;
 (2)  an unbarbed arrow; or
 (3)  a bow that is not equipped with a reel and line.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *