Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3823 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Thompson (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 3823
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
33 May 4, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
44 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 20, 2011, reported
55 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2011, sent
66 to printer.)
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to the regulation of certain telecommunicators; providing
1212 penalties.
1313 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1414 SECTION 1. Section 1701.001, Occupations Code, is amended
1515 by adding Subdivision (7) to read as follows:
1616 (7) "Telecommunicator" means a person acknowledged by
1717 the commission and employed by or serving a law enforcement agency
1818 that performs law enforcement services on a 24-hour basis who
1919 receives, processes, and transmits public safety information and
2020 criminal justice data for the agency by using a base radio station
2121 on a public safety frequency regulated by the Federal
2222 Communications Commission or by another method of communication.
2323 SECTION 2. Section 1701.003(c), Occupations Code, is
2424 amended to read as follows:
2525 (c) This chapter does not prevent an employing agency from
2626 establishing qualifications and standards for hiring or training
2727 officers, [and] county jailers, or telecommunicators that exceed
2828 the commission's minimum standards.
2929 SECTION 3. Section 1701.151, Occupations Code, is amended
3030 to read as follows:
3131 Sec. 1701.151. GENERAL POWERS OF COMMISSION; RULEMAKING
3232 AUTHORITY. The commission may:
3333 (1) adopt rules for the administration of this chapter
3434 and for the commission's internal management and control;
3535 (2) establish minimum standards relating to
3636 competence and reliability, including education, training,
3737 physical, mental, and moral standards, for licensing as an officer,
3838 county jailer, or public security officer or employment as a
3939 telecommunicator;
4040 (3) report to the governor and legislature on the
4141 commission's activities, with recommendations on matters under the
4242 commission's jurisdiction, and make other reports that the
4343 commission considers desirable;
4444 (4) require a state agency or a county, special
4545 district, or municipality in this state that employs officers,
4646 telecommunicators, or county jailers to submit reports and
4747 information;
4848 (5) contract as the commission considers necessary for
4949 services, facilities, studies, and reports required for:
5050 (A) cooperation with municipal, county, special
5151 district, state, and federal law enforcement agencies in training
5252 programs; and
5353 (B) performance of the commission's other
5454 functions; and
5555 (6) conduct research and stimulate research by public
5656 and private agencies to improve law enforcement and police
5757 administration.
5858 SECTION 4. Section 1701.153(a), Occupations Code, is
5959 amended to read as follows:
6060 (a) The commission shall establish reporting standards and
6161 procedures for:
6262 (1) the appointment or employment and the termination
6363 of officers, [and] county jailers, and telecommunicators by law
6464 enforcement agencies;
6565 (2) the activities of licensed training schools; and
6666 (3) other matters the commission considers necessary
6767 for the administration of this chapter.
6868 SECTION 5. Sections 1701.254(a) and (b), Occupations Code,
6969 are amended to read as follows:
7070 (a) The commission may visit and inspect a school conducting
7171 a training course for officers, county jailers, telecommunicators,
7272 or recruits and make necessary evaluations to determine if the
7373 school complies with this chapter and commission rules.
7474 (b) The commission shall develop a risk assessment method to
7575 determine the relative performance of schools conducting training
7676 courses for officers, county jailers, telecommunicators, or
7777 recruits. The commission shall base its schedule for inspection of
7878 schools on the results of the risk assessment.
7979 SECTION 6. Section 1701.312(a), Occupations Code, is
8080 amended to read as follows:
8181 (a) A person who has been convicted of a felony is
8282 disqualified to be an officer, public security officer,
8383 telecommunicator, or county jailer, and the commission may not
8484 issue a license to, and a law enforcement agency may not appoint or
8585 employ, the person.
8686 SECTION 7. Section 1701.313(a), Occupations Code, is
8787 amended to read as follows:
8888 (a) A person who has been convicted of barratry under
8989 Section 38.12, Penal Code, is disqualified to be an officer,
9090 telecommunicator, or county jailer, and the commission may not
9191 issue a license to the person.
9292 SECTION 8. Section 1701.352, Occupations Code, is amended
9393 by adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
9494 (h) The commission shall require a state, county, special
9595 district, or municipal agency that employs telecommunicators to
9696 provide each telecommunicator with 24 hours of crisis
9797 communications instruction approved by the commission. The
9898 instruction must be provided on or before the first anniversary of
9999 the telecommunicator's first day of employment.
100100 SECTION 9. Section 1701.402(b), Occupations Code, is
101101 amended to read as follows:
102102 (b) As a requirement for a basic proficiency certificate,
103103 the commission shall require completion of local courses or
104104 programs of instruction on federal and state statutes that relate
105105 to employment issues affecting peace officers, telecommunicators,
106106 and county jailers, including:
107107 (1) civil service;
108108 (2) compensation, including overtime compensation,
109109 and vacation time;
110110 (3) personnel files and other employee records;
111111 (4) management-employee relations in law enforcement
112112 organizations;
113113 (5) work-related injuries;
114114 (6) complaints and investigations of employee
115115 misconduct; and
116116 (7) disciplinary actions and the appeal of
117117 disciplinary actions.
118118 SECTION 10. Section 1701.405(b), Occupations Code, is
119119 amended to read as follows:
120120 (b) This state or a political subdivision of this state may
121121 not [appoint or] employ a person to act as a telecommunicator unless
122122 the person:
123123 (1) has had at least 40 hours of telecommunicator
124124 training as determined by the commission;
125125 (2) is at least 18 years of age; and
126126 (3) holds a high school diploma or high school
127127 equivalency certificate.
128128 SECTION 11. Section 1701.553(a), Occupations Code, is
129129 amended to read as follows:
130130 (a) A person commits an offense if the person appoints,
131131 employs, or retains an individual as an officer, public security
132132 officer, telecommunicator, or county jailer in violation of Section
133133 1701.312 or 1701.313.
134134 SECTION 12. Sections 1701.405(a)(1) and (3) and
135135 1701.405(e), Occupations Code, are repealed.
136136 SECTION 13. (a) Not later than December 1, 2011, the Texas
137137 Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education shall
138138 adopt rules as necessary to implement the changes in law made by
139139 this Act to Chapter 1701, Occupations Code.
140140 (b) The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
141141 1701.312, 1701.313, and 1701.405(b), Occupations Code, apply only
142142 to a person first employed as a telecommunicator on or after
143143 September 1, 2011. A person first employed as a telecommunicator
144144 before September 1, 2011, is subject to the law in effect at the
145145 time the employment commenced, and the former law is continued in
146146 effect for that purpose.
147147 SECTION 14. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
148148 * * * * *