House | 05/20/2011 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 4766 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1475 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1475 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Filed |