Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3841 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Martinez (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 3841
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 16, 2011;
 May 16, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 19, 2011, rereferred to
 International Relations and Trade; May 21, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 21, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 907
 in Hidalgo County as Rudy Villarreal Road.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.082 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.082.  RUDY VILLARREAL ROAD. (a)  The portion of
 Farm-to-Market Road 907 between U.S. Highway 281 and Owassa Road in
 Hidalgo County is designated as Rudy Villarreal Road.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 highway number, the designation as Rudy Villarreal Road, and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the road and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the road.
 (c)  The requirement that a recognized individual be
 deceased under Section 225.001 does not apply to this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *