Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2146 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2146 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2058 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#722 | Journal Page: 2944 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2944 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2944 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2930 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2930 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 2392 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2324 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Filed |