House | 05/20/2011 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 4766 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2590 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2590 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2583 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4618 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Record vote | RV#1160 | Journal Page: 4215 |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4215 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4215 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 4212 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 4211 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4211 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4185 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3237 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2909 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2909 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Filed |