E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5417
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3337
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4989
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4990
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1337
|
Journal Page: 4989
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4989
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2748
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2747
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2970
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2376
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Referred to International Relations and Trade
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1705
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1652
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2658
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2399
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#603
|
Journal Page: 2399
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2399
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2399
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#598
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Failed to pass to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2363
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2363
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/28/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 388
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 388
|
House
|
12/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|