House
|
05/12/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/12/11 6:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Returned to Calendars Committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3402
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 6, Section 16
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3401
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/10/11 9:30 AM
|
Journal Page: 3294
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 6, Section 16
|
Journal Page: 3294
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3294
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3239
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Point of order sustained
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Resumed consideration
|
|
Journal Page: 3181
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Point of order
|
Rule 4, Section 18(a), Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 12, Section (1)(a)(1)(A)
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
26-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 11, Rule 4, Section 12, and Rule 4, Section 18
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amended
|
25-Isaac
|
Journal Page: 3171
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#833
|
Journal Page: 3170
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
24-Veasey
|
Journal Page: 3170
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
18-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
8-Strama
|
Journal Page: 3160
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
6-Shelton
|
Journal Page: 3159
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
2-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 3151
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2297
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/26/11 5:50 PM
|
Journal Page: 2234
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 2233
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2229
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|