E
|
06/17/2011
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6915
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6043
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6044
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1569
|
Journal Page: 6043
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6043
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3088
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3088
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3088
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3087
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3087
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3087
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3087
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 3083
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3079
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1030
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1686
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#325
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Crownover
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1628
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 389
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 389
|
House
|
12/10/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|