House
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
CSSB234
|
Journal Page: 4210
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2171
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2011
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 390
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 390
|
House
|
01/10/2011
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
12/14/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|