E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5956
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3502
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5275
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5276
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1387
|
Journal Page: 5275
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5275
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4336
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2595
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2154
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1082
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
House
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
House
|
12/20/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|