Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB451 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio III, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 451
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 28, 2011;
 April 7, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a Don't Mess with Texas Water program to
 prevent illegal dumping that affects the surface waters of this
 state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 26, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 26.053 to read as follows:
 Sec. 26.053.  DON'T MESS WITH TEXAS WATER PROGRAM.  (a) The
 commission by rule shall establish a program to prevent illegal
 dumping that affects the surface waters of this state by placing
 signs on major highway water crossings that notify drivers of a
 toll-free number to call to report illegal dumping.
 (b)  The commission shall establish a toll-free number
 hotline that will forward calls to the appropriate law enforcement
 agency.
 (c)  A local government may work with the commission to
 participate in the program. A local government that participates
 in the program may contribute to the cost of operating the toll-free
 number hotline.
 (d)  The Texas Department of Transportation shall cooperate
 with the commission in the placement of signs described by
 Subsection (a).
 (e)  The Texas Department of Transportation shall post a sign
 that complies with program requirements at a major highway water
 crossing at the time a previously posted sign identifying the
 crossing or prohibiting dumping at the crossing is scheduled to be
 replaced.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *