House | 05/13/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 402 | |
House | 12/22/2010 | Filed |