Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB499 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 499
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the additional penalty for collection costs for certain
 delinquent ad valorem taxes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.08(b), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  The governing body of the taxing unit or appraisal
 district, in the manner required by law for official action, may
 provide that taxes that become delinquent on or after June 1 under
 Section 26.07(f), 26.15(e), 31.03, 31.031, 31.032, [or] 31.04, or
 42.42 incur an additional penalty to defray costs of collection.
 The amount of the penalty may not exceed the amount of the
 compensation specified in the applicable contract with an attorney
 under Section 6.30 to be paid in connection with the collection of
 the delinquent taxes.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to additional penalties on taxes that become delinquent on or after
 the effective date of this Act. Additional penalties on taxes that
 become delinquent before the effective date of this Act are
 governed by the law in effect when the taxes become delinquent, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *