Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
Rule 2, Section 1(a)(9)
|
Journal Page: 1595
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#297
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1586
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1540
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Amended
|
8-Hochberg
|
Journal Page: 1537
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
7-Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 1537
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#289
|
Journal Page: 1536
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
6-Phillips, Kolkhorst, and Menendez
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1151
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 735
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 735
|
House
|
03/07/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|